WA HB2318 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state route number 501.
Title
Concerning state route number 501.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-13 | House | Chapter 73, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-04 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2024-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-25 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |