WA HB2284 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-6)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting consumers by prohibiting blocking, throttling, or paid prioritization in the provision of internet service in Washington state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting consumers by prohibiting blocking, throttling, or paid prioritization in the provision of internet service in Washington state.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-29HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2018-01-25HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-25HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-25HouseTED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development
2017-12-14HousePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback