WA HB2269 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tax relief for adaptive automotive equipment for veterans and service members with disabilities.
Title
Concerning tax relief for adaptive automotive equipment for veterans and service members with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-21 | House | Chapter 130, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2018-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-06 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-05 | House | FIN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2018-01-16 | House | CDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
2017-12-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |