WA HB2268 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning ignition interlock device lockout conditions.
Title
Concerning ignition interlock device lockout conditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2017-12-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2268&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2268.pdf |