WA HB2266 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning reasonable accommodation for the expression of breast milk without requiring written certification from a health care professional.
Title
Concerning reasonable accommodation for the expression of breast milk without requiring written certification from a health care professional.
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Dave Paul [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] |
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-25 | House | Chapter 111, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-16 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2019-12-23 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |