WA HB2257 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting back country search and rescue organizations and volunteers through the creation of the back country search and rescue grant program.
Title
Supporting back country search and rescue organizations and volunteers through the creation of the back country search and rescue grant program.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Goehner [R] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Sam Low [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] |
Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Mike Steele [R] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Rep. April Berg [D] | Rep. Joe Timmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-03 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-03 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | SGE - Majority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2024-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-03 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2024-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-26 | House | ICEV - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 52 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 52 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
38 | 52 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |