WA HB2254 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the crimes of harassment.
Title
Addressing the crimes of harassment.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Graves [R] | Rep. Norm Johnson [R] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-30 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2017-12-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |