WA HB2240 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning public improvement contracts involving federally funded transit facility projects.
Title
Concerning public improvement contracts involving federally funded transit facility projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-03-08 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-27 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-02-27 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-02-24 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2012-02-24 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2012-02-24 | TRAN - Majority; without recommendation. | |
2012-02-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2012-02-22 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2012-02-15 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2012-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2012-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2012-01-24 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | |
2012-01-18 | TR - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-01-18 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-01-18 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2012-01-16 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2012-01-10 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6063 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.