WA HB2226 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning collecting data on the H-2A worker program and from certain hand harvesters.
Title
Concerning collecting data on the H-2A worker program and from certain hand harvesters.
Sponsors
Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] | Rep. Liz Berry [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] |
Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-25 | House | Chapter 233, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 56; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | LC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2024-02-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-02-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-26 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5996 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 75 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 75 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |