WA HB2193 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning third-party visitation.
Title
Concerning third-party visitation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-24 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | |
2012-01-19 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2012-01-19 | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-01-19 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-01-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-11 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-01-09 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2012-12-15 | Prefiled for introduction. |