WA HB2179 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning objections to liquor licenses by local governments.
Title
Concerning objections to liquor licenses by local governments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-03-08 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2012-02-23 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection at 9:00 AM. | |
2012-02-21 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-02-14 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2012-02-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 6. | |
2012-02-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | |
2012-01-27 | LG - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-01-27 | LG - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-01-27 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-01-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-09 | First reading, referred to Local Government. | |
2012-12-14 | Prefiled for introduction. |