WA HB2156 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing solar consumer protections.
Title
Providing solar consumer protections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-28 | House | Chapter 349, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-28 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-01 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | LC - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2024-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-19 | House | CPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6256 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.