WA HB2152 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the business and occupation tax exemption for amounts received as credits against contracts with or funds provided by the Bonneville power administration.
Title
Extending the business and occupation tax exemption for amounts received as credits against contracts with or funds provided by the Bonneville power administration.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Terry Nealey [R] | Rep. Matt Manweller [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Rep. Joel Kretz [R] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] |
Sen. June Robinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-19 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB6041 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2152&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2152.pdf |