WA HB2147 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning agriculture pest and disease response.
Title
Concerning agriculture pest and disease response.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-25 | House | Chapter 228, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate receded from amendments. |
2024-03-05 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2024-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-05 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-19 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2024-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6036 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.