WA HB2139 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-17 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the rental of self-service storage facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the rental of self-service storage facilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM.
2024-01-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business.
2024-01-04HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB6203 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-26 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing at 10:30 AM.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19150New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback