WA HB2121 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - First reading, referred to Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - First reading, referred to Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the burden of proof for special education due process hearings.
Title
Concerning the burden of proof for special education due process hearings.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamila Taylor [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Lisa Callan [D] |
Rep. Tarra Simmons [D] | Rep. Darya Farivar [D] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2024-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5883 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-13 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Code Citations
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2121&Year=2023&Initiative=false |
Text | https://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/2121.pdf |