WA HB2113 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding placements of students in residential habilitation centers.
Title
Regarding placements of students in residential habilitation centers.
Sponsors
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] | Rep. Dave Quall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Education. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-26 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-11 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. | |
2009-03-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-09 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-06 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-26 | APPE - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-26 | APPE - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education Appropriations at 9:00 AM. | |
2009-02-25 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education Appropriations at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-25 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Education Appropriations. | |
2009-02-20 | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-20 | ED - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-20 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-10 | First reading, referred to Education. |