WA HB2098 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the women's commission to solicit gifts, grants, and endowments from public or private sources.
Title
Authorizing the women's commission to solicit gifts, grants, and endowments from public or private sources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-19 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-02-20 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-19 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2024-01-03 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |