WA HB2091 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a fallen firefighter memorial.
Title
Establishing a fallen firefighter memorial.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Bronoske [D] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] |
Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] |
Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Alicia Rule [D] | Rep. Joe Timmons [D] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] |
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Skyler Rude [R] | Rep. Mary Fosse [D] | Rep. Greg Nance [D] |
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Suzanne Schmidt [R] | Rep. Chris Stearns [D] | Rep. Kevin Waters [R] |
Rep. Dave Paul [D] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by State Government & Tribal Relations (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by State Government & Tribal Relations (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-13 | House | Chapter 65, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-04 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2024-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-02 | House | CB - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2024-02-02 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2024-01-30 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2024-01-03 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5946 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.