WA HB2087 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating certain boards, committees, and commissions and the transfer of certain duties effective June 30, 2009.
Title
Eliminating certain boards, committees, and commissions and the transfer of certain duties effective June 30, 2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-13 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-10 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5995 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-19 - Effective date 6/30/2009.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2087&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2087.pdf |