WA HB2077 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Postsecondary Education & Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Postsecondary Education & Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning participation in the Washington guaranteed admissions program.
Title
Concerning participation in the Washington guaranteed admissions program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-11 | House | Referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce. |
2024-01-11 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2024-01-02 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |