WA HB2068 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the annexation of unincorporated territory within a code city. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Concerning annexation of unincorporated territory within a city or town. )
Title
Concerning the annexation of unincorporated territory within a code city. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Concerning annexation of unincorporated territory within a city or town. )
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-28 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 74 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | House | Effective date 7/28/2013. |
2013-07-03 | House | Chapter 27, 2013 Laws 2nd Special Session. |
2013-07-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-06-29 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-28 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 74; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 8. |
2013-06-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2013-06-26 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 80; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 10. |
2013-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-06-26 | House | Floor amendment |
2013-06-26 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2013-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. |
2013-06-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-06-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2013-06-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 9. |
2013-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-06-06 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2013-06-03 | House | Held on first reading. |