WA HB2064 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Removing industrial hemp from the scope of the uniform controlled substances act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removing industrial hemp from the scope of the uniform controlled substances act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27HouseEffective date 7/23/2017.
2017-04-27HouseChapter 153, 2017 Laws.
2017-04-27HouseGovernor signed.
2017-04-18HouseDelivered to Governor.
2017-04-17SenatePresident signed.
2017-04-14HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-04-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-04-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-31SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-03-23SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-03-22SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2017-03-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
2017-03-09SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2017-03-02SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2017-02-28HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-02-28HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-02-24HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2017-02-17HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-17HouseCOG - Majority; do pass.
2017-02-16HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:30 AM.
2017-02-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
2017-02-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback