WA HB2046 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning ethics in public service rules governing certain legislative activity.
Title
Concerning ethics in public service rules governing certain legislative activity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-11 | House | Chapter 37, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2022-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-31 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 52 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 52 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 52 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 52 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |