WA HB2039 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Washington information and referral access account to provide funds for the Washington information network 211 system.
Title
Creating the Washington information and referral access account to provide funds for the Washington information network 211 system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-08 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2039&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2039.pdf |