WA HB2025 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amending types of nonprofit organizations qualified to engage in certain bingo gambling activities and changes to the number of occurrences for unlicensed bingo activities.
Title
Amending types of nonprofit organizations qualified to engage in certain bingo gambling activities and changes to the number of occurrences for unlicensed bingo activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - House Committee on Commerce & Gaming: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-03 | House | COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5549 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-12 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 46 | 0209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 46 | 0321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |