WA HB2025 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-07 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-07 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Sharing health care information.
Title
Sharing health care information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-07 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-07 | Chapter 398, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-07 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-23 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-22 | President signed. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-20 | Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-20 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2009-04-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 4. | |
2009-04-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-07 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-31 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | HEA - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-03 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. | |
2009-02-27 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-02-27 | Placed on third reading. | |
2009-02-27 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar. | |
2009-02-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-18 | HS - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-18 | HS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-18 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-16 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-06 | First reading, referred to Human Services. |