WA HB2007 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning reimbursement to eligible providers for medicaid ground emergency medical transportation services.
Title
Concerning reimbursement to eligible providers for medicaid ground emergency medical transportation services.
Sponsors
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Rep. Pat Sullivan [D] | Rep. Melanie Stambaugh [R] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-04-29 | House | Chapter 147, 2015 Laws. |
2015-04-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 7; absent, 1; excused, 2. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-27 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB5840 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.