WA HB2001 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning taxes on in-state broadcasters.
Title
Concerning taxes on in-state broadcasters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-25 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-22 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-07 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |