WA HB2000 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Commerce & Gaming.
Pending: House Commerce & Gaming Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Commerce & Gaming.
Pending: House Commerce & Gaming Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Equalizing differences in the distillery and winery industries by authorizing certain private label spirits.
Title
Equalizing differences in the distillery and winery industries by authorizing certain private label spirits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-14 | House | COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-07 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming |