WA HB1993 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing county treasurers to contract with other county treasurers for services.
Title
Authorizing county treasurers to contract with other county treasurers for services.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Volz [R] | Rep. Vicki Kraft [R] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] |
Rep. Matt Shea [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1993&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1993.pdf |