WA HB1975 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Relieving individuals from paying interest on certain unemployment insurance overpayment assessments.
Title
Relieving individuals from paying interest on certain unemployment insurance overpayment assessments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-07 | House | Chapter 8, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-01 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | LC - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2024-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-19 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2023-12-19 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6028 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.