WA HB1971 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a rangeland fire protection association pilot project.
Title
Concerning a rangeland fire protection association pilot project.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Mary Dye [R] |
Rep. Bryan Sandlin [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - House - House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-31 | House | AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2023-12-18 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6193 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-12 - First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.