WA HB1965 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Effective no later than 6/30/2016 - contingent on notification from OFM
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Effective no later than 6/30/2016 - contingent on notification from OFM
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing a temporary additional fee on licenses and permits issued by the Washington state liquor control board.
Title
Implementing a temporary additional fee on licenses and permits issued by the Washington state liquor control board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | Effective no later than 6/30/2016 - contingent on notification from OFM |
2015-07-06 | House | Effective date 6/30/2016**. |
2015-07-06 | House | Chapter 26, 2015 Laws 3rd Special Session. |
2015-07-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-30 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2015-06-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-29 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-06-29 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-06-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-06-27 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-06-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-13 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-03-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-27 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-02-16 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-16 | House | COG - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-04 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming |
Same As/Similar To
SB5400 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.