WA HB1956 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Effective date 3/31/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Effective date 3/31/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from public disclosure sensitive records pertaining to current and formerly incarcerated individuals' dignity and safety.
Title
Exempting from public disclosure sensitive records pertaining to current and formerly incarcerated individuals' dignity and safety.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hackney [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Tarra Simmons [D] |
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Effective date 3/31/2022. |
2022-03-31 | House | Chapter 272, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 55; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2022-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2022-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-09 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-02-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-27 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5859 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-13 - First reading, referred to State Government & Elections.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 56 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 56 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 56 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 02 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |