WA HB1939 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on April 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-20 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on April 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-20 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning vehicle dealer documentary service fees.
Title
Concerning vehicle dealer documentary service fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-20 | Chapter 123, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-17 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-13 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-10 | President signed. | |
2009-04-09 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-08 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-04-08 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | TRAN - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-25 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-11 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2009-03-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 73; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-09 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-09 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-06 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-27 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-27 | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-27 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-27 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-24 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-03 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5816 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.