WA HB1933 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-12 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-12 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the servicing and right to repair of certain products with digital electronics in a secure and reliable manner.
Title
Supporting the servicing and right to repair of certain products with digital electronics in a secure and reliable manner.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2023-12-13 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6276 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-24 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | New Code | See Bill Text |