WA HB1920 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government and Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government and Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that public employees may attend informational or educational meetings regarding legislative issues.
Title
Clarifying that public employees may attend informational or educational meetings regarding legislative issues.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Geoffrey Simpson [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Rep. Brendan Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-12 | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-09 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-20 | SGTA - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-20 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-20 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-12 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-03 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1920&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1920.pdf |