WA HB1912 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning facilities to house sexually violent predators.
Title
Concerning facilities to house sexually violent predators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-11 | House Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-15 | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-04-19 | Referred to Rules. | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-03-26 | HSC - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-24 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-10 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2009-03-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-27 | CB - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-27 | CB - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-27 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-24 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Capital Budget. | |
2009-02-17 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-17 | PSEP - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-17 | PSEP - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-17 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-11 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-02 | First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5611 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1912&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1912.pdf |