WA HB1906 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-16 - Effective date 4/5/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-16 - Effective date 4/5/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Improving economic security through unemployment compensation.
Title
Improving economic security through unemployment compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-16 | Effective date 4/5/2009. | |
2009-02-16 | Chapter 3, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-02-16 | Governor signed. | |
2009-02-13 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-02-13 | President signed. | |
2009-02-13 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-02-13 | Passed final passage; yeas, 93; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-02-13 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2009-02-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-02-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-12 | Floor amendment | |
2009-02-11 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-11 | Rules suspended. | |
2009-02-11 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-11 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-10 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 6:00 PM. | |
2009-02-09 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2009-02-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-02-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-06 | Floor amendment | |
2009-02-06 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-02-05 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-04 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-02-04 | CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-04 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-04 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-03 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 6:00 PM. | |
2009-02-02 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |