WA HB1897 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-13)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning enrichment funding for charter public schools.
Title
Concerning enrichment funding for charter public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2023-12-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5809 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.