WA HB1879 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Directing the health care authority to issue a request for proposals for integrated managed health and behavioral health services for foster children.
Title
Directing the health care authority to issue a request for proposals for integrated managed health and behavioral health services for foster children.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] |
Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | House | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-05-18 | House | Chapter 283, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-24 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-23 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2015-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-05 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-27 | House | APP - Majority; do pass HCW 15 bill proposed by Health Care & Wellness. |
2015-02-27 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-02-18 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:00 PM. |
2015-02-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |