WA HB1875 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning wildlife damage to agricultural crops.
Title
Concerning wildlife damage to agricultural crops.
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | RDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-04 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |