WA HB1834 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology.
Pending: House State Government, Elections & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology.
Pending: House State Government, Elections & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning campaign finance reporting.
Title
Concerning campaign finance reporting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-15 | House | SEIT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |