WA HB1821 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the crime of attempting to elude a police vehicle.
Title
Clarifying the crime of attempting to elude a police vehicle.
Sponsors
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Mike Pellicciotti [D] |
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Dave Hayes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1821&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1821.pdf |