WA HB1804 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the confidentiality of educator professional growth plans.
Title
Concerning the confidentiality of educator professional growth plans.
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Chad Magendanz [R] | Rep. Kristine Lytton [D] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] |
Rep. Chris Reykdal [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2016-02-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 78; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-01-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-01-21 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2016-01-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Education. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2015-03-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 82; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-17 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
Same As/Similar To
SB5495 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.