WA HB1801 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the repair of digital electronic equipment.
Title
Concerning the repair of digital electronic equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-02-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-02 | House | CPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2022-01-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | New Code | See Bill Text |