WA HB1796 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to Local Government.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning commercial property assessed clean energy and resilience.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning commercial property assessed clean energy and resilience.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13HouseReferred to Local Government.
2020-01-13HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2020-01-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2019-03-11HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-20HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-20HouseLG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-20HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-12HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-31HouseFirst reading, referred to Local Government.

Same As/Similar To

SB5730 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback