WA HB1792 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a fee for certification for the residential services and supports program to cover investigative costs.
Title
Establishing a fee for certification for the residential services and supports program to cover investigative costs.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2018-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 48; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-06 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-22 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2017-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |