WA HB1767 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Behavioral Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a law enforcement grant program to expand alternatives to arrest and jail processes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a law enforcement grant program to expand alternatives to arrest and jail processes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-12SenateReferred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care.
2019-03-08SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2019-03-06HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-06HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-06House2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-04HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-28HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-27HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-21HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-21HousePS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-21HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-19HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-14HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-30HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback